open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:19-26407-
    Party Name:Susan K Turin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Close Bankruptcy Case with Order Discharging Trustee]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Case Reassignment (JKO to PGH)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Requirement to File a Certificate of Completion of a Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certification of Compliance and Request for Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Voluntary Petition Ch 13 [ECF]]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?759777
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =