open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:1:20-cv-20658
    Party Name:Herrera v. Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Scheduling Mediation]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Mediation]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Requirements]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?566390
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =