U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-20334-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 28, 2025: [- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion to Seal (Public)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Disclosure of Presentence Investigation/Plea and Sentencing Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.