U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-mj-08207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pineda Sanchez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Merged Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Reassignment of AUSA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Demand for Disclosure of Expert Witness Summaries]
  • April 25, 2025: [Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Assignment of Assistant Federal Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report Re: Counsel Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance (WITH OPTIONAL DPPA ORDER)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 19, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 19, 2025: [Order]
  • April 19, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.