U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50083
  • Case Name: Brian Paul Good and Amy Beth Good
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [utility: Submission Error Notification (SEN) - Refiling Required (Paperless/Pro se Form/PDF)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [Schedules & Statements (all remaining deficient docs)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (AJTA)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [Auto-Docket of Online Payment]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Online Payment]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [Employee Income Records - Payment Advices OR Stmt/Cert of No Employment Income]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records - Payment Advices OR Stmt/Cert of No Employment Income]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Colon, Mary W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.