U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10105
  • Case Name: Erica Nicole Williams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Clerk's Notice of Compliance (Paperless)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Auto-Docket of Online Payment]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Employee Income Records - Payment Advices OR Stmt/Cert of No Employment Income]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Corrective Entry w/Checklist]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Order & Notice re IFP Response Period (CA) (PDF/Form)]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (AJTA)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Chapter 7 Stmt Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption Abuse (122A-1Supp) (incl Amended)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Stmt Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption Abuse (122A-1Supp) (incl Amended)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (Form 103B)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (Form 103B)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bender, Theresa M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.