U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30401
  • Case Name: Gregory Matthew Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Request for Notices (Not Attorney Appearance)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Receipt of Voluntary Petition Filing Fee]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of Pro Bono & Bankruptcy Resources (PDF/Form)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Order Establishing Duties of the Debtor (Ch 13) (Form)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Repeat Filer]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Order to Show Cause re Matrix Deficiency (PDF / Form)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice of 341(a) Meeting and Initial Confirmation Hearing - Ch 13]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Statement of Assistance from Pro Se Debtor re Voluntary Petition]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Assistance from Pro Se Debtor re Voluntary Petition]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Numbers/SSN (Restricted Access)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Duncan, Leigh A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.