U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TURNER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Travel]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.