U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RIDLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.