U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00310
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GRIGGERS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order for Pretrial Conference]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.