U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00150
  • Case Name: BAPTISTE v. WASHBURN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order for Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order for Response (Habeas Petition)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.