open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-22714
    Party Name:Ruth A Taylor
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Close Bankruptcy Case - Auto]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Chapter 13 Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Dismiss Case for Other Reasons]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Request Chapter 13 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [(E) Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1491657
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =