U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01506
  • Case Name: MAYE v. ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CARE CENTER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [SCHEDULING Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.