open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:20-cr-00165-1
    Party Name:USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter Lifting Suppression - Indictment/Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Computation Summary - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond (Set/Revoke/Forfeit)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment and Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Information]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Warrant/Summons - 12C]
    Date Published:July 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea and Sentencing Hearing Combined]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Digital Audio File]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Continued Detention]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Psychological evaluation (Sealed)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response to Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended: Relief re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Court]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [ Report: Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Post Trial/Post Hearing Brief]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Indictment/Counts]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Strike]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:September 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Dismissal by Government - (MJ cases only)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplemental Addendum]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Quash]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation 22 Documents Received]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Case No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amendment/Supplemental Pleading]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Revoke Bond]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Documents Received]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:September 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Order (ADMIN USE ONLY!)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:July 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:July 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript (FILED UNDER SEAL)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order of Removal to Another District]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Rule 5 Hearings]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Removal/Identity Hearing]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Reassignment or Recusal]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Waiver (Post Hearing)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter of Transfer In]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Satisfaction of Judgment (Fine/Costs/Restitution)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Departure from Standard Sentencing Guidelines]
    Date Published:November 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Dismissal by Government]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Designated Clerk's Record]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Entry of Felony Plea Before Magistrate]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion and Order to dismiss complaint]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibits]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Notes]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions Given/Refused]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial Without Voir Dire]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury List]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial With Voir Dire]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rules of trial]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Ownership]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change Venue/Transfer Case]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Preliminary Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Final Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Examination or Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Expedite]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss by Government (indictment/defendant from case)]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revoke]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evidentiary Hearing (links/refers to motions only)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations (Sealed)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations (Sealed)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Forfeiture/Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark ]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Finding Probable Cause Order]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture Hearing]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Call Witnesses at Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [BOP Designation]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Not Call Witnesses at Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report - SEALED]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver/Withdrawal Pretrial Motion Hearing (Rules Motions)]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
    Date Published:February 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restitution Questionnaire]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [New Trial ]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acquittal]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Custody]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Receipt]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict on Forfeiture]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions ]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict (final day of trial)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prelminary Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial Held But Not Concluded (day two, three, etc.)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Voir Dire (First Day of Trial)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest ]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript (Sealed)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:January 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Determination of Admissibility]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport Notice]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Warrant Returned]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment for Revocation]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript - Suppression Hearing]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Competency Hearing]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supervised Release/Probation Revocation Sentencing Computation - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation or Prob/Sup Release or Pretrial Action]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Case]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for SAIL Program]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Terminating Counsel]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to File Out of Time]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver/Withdrawal of Pretrial Motions (SPM)]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [File Out of Time]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Retroactive Application of Sentencing Guidelines re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Eligibility Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (Financial)]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation and Waiver (2014 Drug Guidelines - Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Substitution]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Sealed)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (Suppress)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Determination by Court of Admissibility of Arguably Suppressible Evidence)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Execution]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:May 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:May 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:May 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:April 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions or Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:January 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table - Amendment 782]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Payment Voucher for Attorney Appointment]
    Date Published:November 25, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Psychiatric Report - SEALED]
    Date Published:November 25, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 24, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117303
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =