U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Turner et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Minute Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2025: [Motion Continue Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Regarding Pretrial Procedure]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.