U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cunningham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Waiver of Right to Appear in Person]
  • October 03, 2022: [Consent to Plead Guilty Before U.S. Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Indictment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.