U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 18, 2023: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Waiver of Right to Appear in Person]
  • December 16, 2022: [Consent to Plead Guilty Before U.S. Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • October 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.