U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz-Medrano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Consent to Plead Guilty Before U.S. Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Related Case Memorandum]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • November 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.