U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00691-JRK-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Winters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Referring Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.