U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dorsey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Bond Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 23, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.