open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:6:19-cv-00203
    Party Name:Imagination International, Inc. et al v. Kabushiki Kaisha Too Marker Products, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Scheduling]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Stay]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?143411
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =