open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:6:19-cr-00049-1
    Party Name:USA v. Tucker
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PROB 12AS - Report on Person Under Supervision]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment & Commitment]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Hearing]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1- Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?143334
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =