open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

OREGON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01463
    Party Name:American Economy Insurance Company et al v. NW Building Forensics, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Correction of the Record]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?147828
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =