U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-00336
  • Case Name: Ledford v. Oregon State Hospital et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
  • May 13, 2025: [Address Change]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Summary Judgment or 12(b) Dismissal Advice Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response]
  • April 11, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Returned Mail]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.