U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02043
  • Case Name: Roy et al v. City of Burns et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • March 12, 2025: [Leave]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.