U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00310
  • Case Name: Chambers v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • May 02, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • May 02, 2025: [Settlement Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 28, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • March 27, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.