U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00576
  • Case Name: E. L. et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismissal (60-day) - Terminate Case]
  • April 22, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
  • March 13, 2025: [Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.