U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00395
  • Case Name: Yes v. O'Regan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.