U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez-Franco
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Examination]
  • March 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [A First Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [5-Brady Disclosure Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 14, 2025: [1- Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint - ALL TYPES]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.