U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01586
  • Case Name: ESHA Research, Inc. v. Cronometer Software, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • May 06, 2025: [Joint Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [9CONV - SEAL DOC COURT USER ONLY ROUTINE]
  • March 19, 2025: [9CONV - Conventionally Filed Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 18, 2025: [0seal - Seal Docket Entry and/or Document ONLY use with other selection]
  • March 18, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 18, 2025: [File Document Under Seal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 18, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.