U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00357
  • Case Name: Goldman v. Jeff Regis / Instant Auto Body
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 30, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Returned Mail]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Returned Mail]
  • March 25, 2025: [Service Papers Received]
  • March 21, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Application for Leave to Proceed IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.