U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00453
  • Case Name: Hamlin v. Poirier et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • March 18, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.