U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00244
  • Case Name: Casala, LLC et al v. Kotek et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing Held]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Consolidate]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 01, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear as Amicus Curiae]
  • March 18, 2025: [Transcript of Proceedings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.