U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00376
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Skopos Financial, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Sur-Reply to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • May 07, 2025: [Leave]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.