U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valdez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [1-First / Initial Criminal Master Minutes]
  • April 09, 2025: [5-Brady Disclosure Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 08, 2025: [1- Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.