U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01937
  • Case Name: CSAA General Insurance Company v. Carroll et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 29, 2025: [Default Entry]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.