U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Zavyalov v. Legacy Health
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Transcript of Proceedings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Rule 16 Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 30, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.