U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00622
  • Case Name: ORTEGA GONZALEZ v. Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 04, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript of Proceedings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 24, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript Designation and Order Form]
  • April 23, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Hearing Held]
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 18, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 16, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.