U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00656
  • Case Name: RLH Assets, LLC v. ESHA Research, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.