U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00058
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 3,086,226.36 USDT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • May 01, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Claim]
  • April 24, 2025: [Proof of Publication]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.