open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:19-32209
    Party Name:Ralph Arnold Zweigle, Sr. and Brenda Sue Zweigle
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice Resetting Dismissal Hearing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice Rescheduling Confirmation Hearing (BNC NOTICING)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Courtroom Minutes (CM)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Response]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held - Trustee Does Not Recommend Confirmation]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Order on Chapter 13 Fixed Fee Agreement - Non Standard]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Confirmation Hearing and Plan Summary (batch)(BNC NOTICING)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors (batch)(BNC NOTICING)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Order for EFT or ACH Payments]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Witness List]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Proposed Order for EFT or ACH Payments and Debtor Certification]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Pay Advices or Certification]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Plan Summary and Statistical Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Summary of Assets and Liabilities Form 106Sum]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule J]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule I]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule H]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule G]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule D]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule C]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Order: Possible Future Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Initial Order for Chapter 13 Case]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Taxing Authority]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Fixed Fee Agreement - Non Standard]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice of Duplicate Case Filing]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Creditors)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) [system event]]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [none]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?431999
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =