open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:7:19-cr-01708-1
    Party Name:USA v. Moctezuma-Galindo
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Presentence Investigation Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Addendum]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Attachment to Addendum to PSR]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Adopting Report and Recommendation - Guilty Plea - FORM]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing Dates (FORM)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Magistrate to Plea]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Re-Arraignment ADI - McAllen]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Setting/Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Order - FORM]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order (FORM)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1702850
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =