open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00054
    Party Name:Indorama Ventures Oxides LLC v. M/V Natchez Express, U.S. Official No. 127460, her engines, apparel, furniture, equipment, appurtenances, tackle, etc., in rem et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?195543
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =