open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:5:20-cr-01642-1
    Party Name:USA v. Gooding
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Setting/Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order (FORM) - Laredo]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - ADI]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance ADI]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5(c)(3) - (40) Documents Received]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Order]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Location Start]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (SEALED)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Arrest - Rule 5/Rule 32.1 (Magistrate Case Only)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Other Notice]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (PUBLIC ENTRY)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Order Finding Probable Cause on Felony Complaint (FORM) - Laredo]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Proposed Complaint]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Statement in Support of Probable Cause]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1788372
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =