open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00056
    Party Name:Long v. Boucher et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Propose Schedule]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115233
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =