open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00141
    Party Name:Goodwin v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Appeal Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117827
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =