U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hansen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.