U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00412-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lemus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.