U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hatch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [RISE Program Referral Order]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.