U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Strike]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.